TYNE & WEAR RDA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide riding lessons and riding therapy for all ages and levels of disability. We also have an education programme with the horse as the tool, to aid clients to achieve ADSAN and other nationally recognised qualifications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Animals
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- Sunderland
Governance
- 13 February 2014: Standard registration
- 22 January 2016: Funds received from 1073555 TYNE AND WEAR RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
- WASHINGTON RIDING CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Archer | Chair | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Duncan | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Sharon BOYLE | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN POTTS | Trustee | 10 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275.60k | £265.05k | £271.08k | £289.89k | £380.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £266.83k | £232.75k | £253.51k | £287.88k | £336.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.00k | N/A | £7.23k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/12/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE-DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE TYNE AND WEAR AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tyne & Wear R D A Group
Washington Riding Centre
Stephenson Road
Washington
NE37 3HR
- Phone:
- 01914162745
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window