THE JAMES NEILL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 503203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To be applied for the welfare of James Neill employees and former employees and former employees and for such charitable purpose benefiting persons residing within 20 miles of Sheffield Cathedral as the trustees in their uncontrolled discretion shall from time to time decided.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £64,706
Total expenditure: £68,797

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 May 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Michael Gerard Neill ACA Trustee 06 February 2025
MARJORIE COOTE ANIMAL CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
MARJORIE COOTE OLD PEOPLES CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
THE HUGH NEILL CHARITY
Received: On time
Penelope Mary Jewitt Trustee 12 September 2022
MARJORIE COOTE OLD PEOPLES CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Caroline Jane Lawrenson Trustee 12 September 2022
CHILDREN'S BEREAVEMENT CENTRE
Received: On time
NICHOLAS JAMES ANTHONY HUTTON MBE Trustee 12 September 2022
THE HOSPITAL OF GILBERT, EARL OF SHREWSBURY AT SHEFFIELD
Received: On time
MARJORIE COOTE OLD PEOPLES CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
CHURCH BURGESSES TRUST
Received: On time
THE HOUNSFIELD PENSIONS CHARITY
Received: On time
SHEFFIELD TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
WILLIAM ELLIS BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE SHEFFIELD DIAL- A -RIDE CLUB
Received: On time
SARAH DOROTHY NEILL Trustee 08 August 2015
MARJORIE COOTE OLD PEOPLES CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
MARJORIE COOTE ANIMAL CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
LADY NEILL DL Trustee 23 May 1990
MARJORIE COOTE ANIMAL CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
MARJORIE COOTE OLD PEOPLES CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
THE HUGH NEILL CHARITY
Received: On time
J W CHAPMAN EARLESMERE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £59.90k £47.44k £57.80k £62.45k £64.71k
Total expenditure £69.59k £55.98k £62.81k £74.77k £68.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 18 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 18 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LADY NEILL DL
THE JAMES NEILL TRUST FUND
BARN COTTAGE
LINDRICK COMMON
WORKSOP
S81 8BA
Phone:
01759322102
Website:

neillcharities.com