Accounts and annual returns INTEGRITY HARVESTFIELD UNITED PENTECOSTAL CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1149554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2023 20 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2022 09 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 06 April 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required