UPPER BEEDING BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision for the community of a sacred space, open to those of all faiths and none, with regular public worship in Baptist Tradition, and a community meeting point with access to various avenues of support and help. The spiritual and moral education of children. The alleviation of poverty at home and abroad. Support for the elderly, at home and in care, and comfort for the bereaved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 29 October 2012: Standard registration
- 17 October 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1173420 UPPER BEEDING BAPTIST CHURCH: THE HUB, BEEDING
- UBBC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.28k | £148.12k | £179.31k | £228.35k | £163.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.30k | £132.75k | £176.51k | £155.82k | £163.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 09 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2017
(These accounts |
09 August 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 24 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 24 May 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 22 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 22 July 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 12 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 12 May 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window