THE ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF EAST ANGLIA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ZOOLOGY, ANIMAL WELFARE AND ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION BY INSPIRING INTEREST BY THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ZOOLOGY AND STUDY OF ANIMALS BY RUNNING ONE OR MORE ZOOLOGICAL GARDENS OR SCIENTIFIC ESTABLISHMENTS.PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO WILDLIFE AND NATURAL HISTORY AND RELATED SCIENTIFIC FIELDS, AND CONTRIBUTION TO THE CONSERVATION OF WILDLIFE, BIODIVERSITY AND NATURAL HABITATS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£7,209,237
Donations and legacies | £385.38k | |
Charitable activities | £4.35m | |
Other trading activities | £2.46m | |
Investments | £12.90k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,408,454
Raising funds | £2.30m | |
Charitable activities | £6.11m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £8,679 from 2 government contract(s) and £125,250 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £2.30m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.11m |
People

117 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 December 2012: Standard registration
- BANHAM ZOO, AFRICA ALIVE!, ZSEA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Jane Penny | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Gardiner | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kelly Edmunds | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW HASSAN | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR FREDERIC EDOUARD BARRELET | Trustee | 27 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Smith | Trustee | 27 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.42m | £6.30m | £8.64m | £7.30m | £7.21m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.01m | £5.70m | £6.72m | £7.71m | £8.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.68k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £547.39k | £1.33m | £23.35k | £125.25k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £653.13k | £441.60k | £168.92k | £210.23k | £385.38k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.71m | £1.36m | £2.13m | £2.36m | £2.46m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.06m | £3.62m | £5.77m | £4.57m | £4.35m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £36 | £0 | £4.08k | £12.90k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £879.12k | £566.47k | £150.68k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.46m | £4.25m | £4.47m | £5.33m | £6.11m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.55m | £1.46m | £2.26m | £2.37m | £2.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.79k | £15.92k | £16.74k | £1.57m | £32.88k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £15.79k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £188.79k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.66m | £3.50m | £4.41m | £4.15m | £4.18m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £835.26k | £2.63m | £3.50m | £2.14m | £621.76k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.43m | £3.47m | £3.34m | £2.14m | £2.02m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/12/2012 as amended on 30 Sep 2022 as amended on 30 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
4.1.A FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ZOOLOGY AND RELATED SUBJECTS, BY: 4.1.A.I INSPIRING STIMULATING ENCOURAGING AND SUSTAINING INTEREST AND ENTHUSIASM IN THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ZOOLOGY AND THE KNOWLEDGE AND STUDY OF ANIMALS AND OTHER WILDLIFE BY ESTABLISHING AND RUNNING ONE OR MORE ZOOLOGICAL GARDENS OR SIMILAR SCIENTIFIC EXHIBITIONS; 4.1.A.II PROMOTING AND CARRYING OUT SCIENTIFIC STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO ANIMALS AND OTHER WILDLIFE AND NATURAL HISTORY AND RELATED SCIENTIFIC FIELDS IN PARTICULAR WHERE SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH COULD HELP THE CONSERVATION OF SPECIES AND HABITATS AND THE MAINTENANCE AND RESTORATION OF NATURAL HABITATS AND PUBLISHING OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 4.1.A.III INSPIRING AND ENGAGING WITH THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE LIVING WORLD AND THE ENVIRONMENT AND GENERAL ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION. 4.1.B THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE BY: 4.1.B.I PROMOTING AND CARRYING OUT SCIENTIFIC STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO ANIMALS AND OTHER WILDLIFE AND NATURAL HISTORY AND RELATED SCIENTIFIC FIELDS IN PARTICULAR WHERE SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH COULD HELP THE CONSERVATION OF SPECIES AND HABITATS AND THE MAINTENANCE AND RESTORATION OF NATURAL HABITATS; 4.1.B.II PROMOTING AND CONTRIBUTING TO AND SUPPORTING THE CONSERVATION OF ANIMALS AND WILDLIFE AND IN PARTICULAR THREATENED SPECIES; 4.1.B.III PROMOTING AND CONTRIBUTING TO AND SUPPORTING CONSERVATION PROGRAMMES BOTH IN SITU AND EX SITU; 4.1.B.IV INSPIRING AND ENGAGING INTEREST OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ANIMALS AND WILDLIFE AND IN PARTICULAR THREATENED SPECIES; 4.1.B.V PROMOTING AND CONTRIBUTING TO THE CONSERVATION OF ANIMALS AND OTHER WILDLIFE, BIODIVERSITY AND NATURAL HABITATS IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE; 4.1.B.VI THE APPROPRIATE BREEDING AND OR MAINTAINING OF ENDANGERED ANIMALS AND THREATENED SPECIES AND OTHER WILDLIFE; 4.1.B.VII ESTABLISHING AND RUNNING ONE OR MORE ZOOLOGICAL GARDENS OR SIMILAR SCIENTIFIC EXHIBITIONS. 4.1.C THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION BY: 4.1.C.I PROMOTING AND CONTRIBUTING TO AND SUPPORTING THE CONSERVATION OF ANIMALS AND OTHER WILDLIFE AND IN PARTICULAR THREATENED SPECIES; 4.1.C.II INSPIRING AND ENGAGING INTEREST OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN CONSERVATION OF ANIMALS AND OTHER WILDLIFE AND IN PARTICULAR THREATENED SPECIES; 4.1.C.III PROMOTING AND CONTRIBUTING TO THE CONSERVATION OF ANIMALS AND OTHER WILDLIFE, BIODIVERSITY AND NATURAL HABITATS IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE; 4.1.C.IV ENGAGING WITH THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE LIVING WORLD AND THE ENVIRONMENT AND GENERAL ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION; 4.1.C.V PROMOTING AND CONTRIBUTING TO AND SUPPORTING CONSERVATION PROGRAMMES BOTH IN SITU AND EX SITU. 4.1.D THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR SOLE DISCRETION DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Zsea HQ
The Zoological Society of East Angl
Kenninghall Road
Banham
Norfolk
NR16 2HE
- Phone:
- 01953 887771
- Email:
- info@zsea.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window