SAINT MICHAELS COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides facility at St. Michael's Community Hall Lichfield Street Stone for the benefit of the inhabitants of St. Michael's Parish Stone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 11 April 1974: Standard registration
- SAINT MICHAEL'S HALL, STONE (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simone Plant | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLA ABBOTT | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JEAN SUTTON | Trustee | 19 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.53k | £7.34k | £5.59k | £10.54k | £9.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.58k | £3.46k | £7.52k | £10.88k | £5.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22/07/1975 AS AMENDED ON 24/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL, STONE, FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE OUT OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MICHAEL'S, STONE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Castle Court
STONE
Staffordshire
ST15 8YY
- Phone:
- 01785 812747
- Email:
- rector.stone@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window