OTLEY ACTION FOR OLDER PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims and Objectives The charity is established to relieve the following charitable needs of older people living in Otley, Pool and Arthington: 1) To relieve poverty 2) To preserve and protect good health 3) To advance education, and 4) To promote the social inclusion of such people who are excluded from society because they are house-bound.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £69,788 from 1 government contract(s) and £30,201 from 6 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 04 February 2013: Standard registration
- 02 July 2014: Funds received from 1060379 OTLEY ACTION FOR OLDER PEOPLE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Page | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Padden | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY DALBY DIPSW | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Frank Jordan | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Chapman | Trustee | 10 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nigel James Gill | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ailsa Bearpark | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|||||
PAM GILL | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DORIS GAGEN | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EVELEIGH | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.72k | £244.54k | £242.40k | £255.65k | £403.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.10k | £217.14k | £221.67k | £255.04k | £349.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £69.79k | |
|
Income from government grants | £84.37k | £119.76k | £112.52k | £88.65k | £30.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/01/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO RELIEVE THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE NEEDS OF OLDER PEOPLE LIVING IN OTLEY, POOL & ARTHINGTON:- 1)TO RELIEVE POVERTY; 2)TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH; 3)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION;AND 4)TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF SUCH PEOPLE WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY BECAUSE THEY ARE HOUSE-BOUND, OR WHO ARE UNABLE TO DRIVE OR EASILY ACCESS PUBLIC TRANSPORT AND TO ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
OTLEY, POOL & ARTHINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Otley Action for Older People
Crossgate
OTLEY
LS21 3AA
- Phone:
- 01943463965
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window