MIRACLES IN MOTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We focus on activities that provide and engaging environment for the orphan children and those on the streets inclusive of those with various disabilities. We focus on bringing gifts and aid first hand to children who need it world wide. Our aim is to bring a smile to a child's face and provide for them a safe environment to live in with an education setting where possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Reading
- Bulgaria
- Ghana
- Pakistan
- Thailand
Governance
- 29 October 2012: Standard registration
- 23 November 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- M.I.M (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | £50 | £273 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.43k | £312 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 28 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 15 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 04 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED ON 25/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE FOCUSING ON CHILDREN IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window