Accounts and annual returns THE 12TH APOSTOLIC CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity number: 1154409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 20 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 20 February 2025 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 20 February 2025 723 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 20 February 2025 1088 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 03 April 2022 399 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required