Financial history THE 12TH APOSTOLIC CHURCH OF CHRIST

Charity number: 1154409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £4.00k £0 £6.00k £7.00k £6.00k
Total expenditure £3.80k £0 £5.52k £5.52k £5.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A