THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS WITH ST BARNABAS, WESTON-SUPER-MARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England Parish Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Somerset
Governance
- 30 October 2012: Previously excepted registration
- ST NICHOLAS WITH ST BARNABAS, WESTON-SUPER-MARE BUT PRIOR TO 22/6/2010 AS UPHILL TEAM MINISTRY AND PRIOR TO 16/7/1992 AS PCC OF ST. NICHOLAS UPHILL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARK MADELEY | Chair | 26 October 2012 |
|
|||||||
Frances Pelengaris | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Jeffrey John Realff | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Angela James | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Barbara Anne Lewis | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Neil O'Donoghue | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Gail Elizabeth Rowley | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Cheryl Lyn Costigan | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Pauline Farley | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
LYNN PACK | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID PACK | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Annabel Jane Loring | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES STEPHEN LORING | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.79k | £74.56k | £118.17k | £86.67k | £106.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.81k | £82.39k | £132.87k | £94.92k | £97.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Barnabas Parish Office
Westbury Crescent
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS23 4RB
- Phone:
- 01934641863
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window