OAKTREE PLAYSCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Oaktree Playscheme provides holiday and after school activity on South Acton estate for 8-12 year old's. The Club was founded to meet the need for free after school provision on South Acton estate. We provide indoor/outdoor activities, drama, dance, parties, quizzes & singing, table tennis, boxed games, construction toys, books, puzzles, cooking, snooker and more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 12 February 2013: Standard registration
- 09 June 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 June 2016: Re-registered
- OAKTREE AFTERSCHOOL CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIVENNE ANDERSON | Chair | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAULA MCCLEAN | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
CINDY BASHFORD | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHARON MARSHALL | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
LORAINE ANJORIN | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
NARBDA PANDIT | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
SERENA NATASHA TOMLIN | Trustee | 08 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.14k | £44.57k | £23.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.81k | £30.36k | £21.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1301 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1301 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1666 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1666 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 DEC 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: 1) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 2) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
112-114 BOLLO BRIDGE ROAD
LONDON
W3 8DD
- Phone:
- 07930100343
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window