CHAMPS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support Children, Young people, Parents and Carers that have a person in the family with Hirschsprung's Disease. We provide solace in what can be an isolating illness by arranging activities, outings and parties. Where funds allow we donate to research into Hirschsprung's Disease. Contact Sara on 07966492275 or e-mail champsappeal@live.co.uk for more info.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 January 2013: Standard registration
- 13 June 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 13 June 2023: Funds transferred to 1188493 WILLIAM'S GIFT
- CHAMPS APPEAL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.57k | £5.52k | £3.39k | £1.51k | £2.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.12k | £10.28k | £6.93k | £1.26k | £216 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MAR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 16/10/2011 AS AMENDED ON 03/01/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WITH HIRSCHSPRUNG’S DISEASE AND THEIR PARENTS, FAMILIES AND CARERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A)PROVIDING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT B)PROMOTING PUBLIC AWARENESS IN REGARD TO HIRSCHSPRUNG’S DISEASE C)ENCOURAGING SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSE, CARE AND TREATMENT OF HIRSCHSPRUNG’S DISEASE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window