Financial history WHITECROSS HEREFORD PTFA

Charity number: 503213
Charity reporting is overdue by 1287 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.63k £1.20k £3.44k £5.75k £6.36k
Total expenditure £9.74k £403 £1.01k £4.13k £5.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A