6TH NEWARK (CHRISTCHURCH) SEA SCOUT GROUP (TL/2366)

Charity number: 503216
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

water Activities:Teaching of power boating,Sailing,Canoeing as well as ordinary scouting activities mainly in the Newark area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £39,805
Total expenditure: £43,678

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD STEPHEN MOYSES Chair 06 March 2023
NEWARK DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
LYNSEY REGAN Trustee 24 February 2024
None on record
ALISTER THORN Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
HEATHER MOYSES Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
MARK PATTINSON Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Gillian Mary Fraser Trustee 07 July 2016
None on record
KNEALE EDIS Trustee 01 April 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.74k £18.47k £6.22k £7.11k £39.81k
Total expenditure £24.66k £8.15k £12.55k £15.90k £43.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 February 2025 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 February 2025 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1C School Lane
Farndon
NEWARK
Nottinghamshire
NG24 3SL
Phone:
01636700670
Website:

No information available