Financial history MID TENDRING EDUCATION PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1150415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/03/2020 28/03/2021 28/03/2022 28/03/2023 28/03/2024
Total gross income £132.53k £135.80k £117.34k £159.74k £159.74k
Total expenditure £176.28k £112.70k £142.35k £155.05k £155.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.40k N/A £9.68k N/A N/A