Trustees SAHODAR UK

Charity number: 1151639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebekah Bale Chair 15 May 2018
None on record
Jean Houston Aldersley Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record
Timothy Keith Provost Trustee 09 March 2016
None on record
Liza-Kate Crewe Trustee 13 May 2015
None on record
David Charles Ball Trustee 13 May 2015
None on record
John Charles George Trustee 05 December 2012
None on record