THE WEST WOLDS UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the middle aged and older people (who are not in full time gainful employment) in the Western Wolds of Lincolnshire and surrounding locality
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
67 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 31 October 2012: Standard registration
- WEST WOLDS U3A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Britton | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Annne Whelan | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Rupp | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
KAY GREEN | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Nicholas John Wilson | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA BEARD | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
GARY BEIGHTON | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Terry Francis | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.48k | £14.04k | £18.18k | £13.96k | £15.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.70k | £13.29k | £17.78k | £13.57k | £15.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 NOV 1999
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE U3A ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE (WHO ARE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN THE WESTERN WOLDS OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cherry Trees
West Torrington
MARKET RASEN
Lincolnshire
LN8 5SQ
- Phone:
- 01673 843935
- Email:
- chairman@westwoldsu3a.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window