WE ARE ALL HUMANS (WAAH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are currently looking at areas of activity and financier s to promote our cause.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 January 2013: Standard registration
- INDO BRITISH CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gulamabbas Bharwani | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GULAMABBAS MOHAMED BHARWANI | Trustee | 30 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 387 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 February 2023 | 752 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/06/2014
Charitable objects
(I) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN WORLDWIDE BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY (II) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISATER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID. (III) TO ASSIST IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY CHARITY WORLWIDE WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY DEVELOPING THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND MORAL CAPABILITIES THROUGH LESIURE TIME ACTIVITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 BOOTHS FARM ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B42 2NP
- Phone:
- 01214564456
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window