Financial history IHELP GLOBAL

Charity number: 1152490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £110.84k £74.32k £79.00k £796.27k £280.41k
Total expenditure £131.30k £54.42k £32.00k £835.71k £313.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £585 £10.55k £4.60k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £758.77k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £37.50k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £791.41k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £44.31k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £39.66k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £622.16k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A