YOUR MONEY COUNTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The production, promotion and selling of books, DVDs, study notes etc. concerning the management of finance from a Biblical perspective. Initiating and running seminars, conferences and training courses for small & large groups. Establishing a web site to promote it's resources and as a catalyst for disseminating information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 November 2013: Standard registration
- 18 November 2014: Funds received from 1122691 CROWN FINANCIAL MINISTRIES TRUST
- COMPASS (Working name)
- CHRISTIAN FINANCIAL COMPASS TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MARK GABRIEL LLOYDBOTTOM | Chair | 19 February 2013 |
|
|||||
MRS RHODA MAY LLOYDBOTTOM | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.63k | £837 | £476 | £1.15k | £1.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.89k | £1.15k | £528 | £491 | £1.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 17/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE TRUST SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN PARTICULAR THE FINANCIAL PRINCIPLES OF THE BIBLE IN PROMOTING SOUND PRINCIPALS OF FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT, BOTH PERSONAL AND CORPORATE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST OUR LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
85 Court Farm Road
Longwell Green
BRISTOL
BS30 9AE
- Phone:
- 07767872287
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window