Trustees CARDIFF UNIT 68 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 503230

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Parsons | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Baldry | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Pontin | Trustee | 14 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Higgon-Young | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hunt | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Gibbins | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|||||
FRASER Ingram | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.