Financial history CATS IN CRISIS LINCOLN

Charity number: 1150145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £39.63k £45.74k £65.16k £82.76k £72.01k
Total expenditure £27.37k £41.30k £49.42k £80.26k £52.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A