THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (HIS GLORY ARENA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a. Advancement of the Christian Faith in the United Kingdom or abroad b. The relief of persons who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress or who are aged or sick in the United Kingdom and abroad The principal activities of the Charity are worship and the involvement of various ministries and ministers of religion, propagating Christian tenets to both members and non-members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MODUPE ADEDERO | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADEDOKUN ADEYEMI ADEKUNLE | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOROMOKE OGUNBADEWA | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MABEL OMOYOKA FOY YAMAH | Trustee | 08 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
OLUWAKEMI OLABASI AUSTEN- OKORONKWO | Trustee | 08 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.43k | £15.33k | £18.55k | £18.05k | £21.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.92k | £15.05k | £5.97k | £16.43k | £16.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 September 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN LONDON AND OVERSEAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF SERVICES, PRAYER MEETINGS AND RELIGIOUS CONFERENCES. B) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF OF PEOPLE LIVING IN LONDON BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GRANTS OF MONEY, AND/OR GOODS OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS
Contact information
- Address:
-
235 Wickham Lane
London
SE2 0YB
- Phone:
- 02083201662
- Email:
- rccghisgloryarena@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window