Financial history IHYA Foundation

Charity number: 1150431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £43.56k £15.37k £21.03k £44.22k £87.39k
Total expenditure £30.54k £18.66k £26.14k £42.55k £83.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A