TAMU SAMAJ UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ON 16 OCT 2016 - TAMU SAMAJ UK COMPLETED RECONSTRUCTION OF SCHOOL BUILDING IN DHADING NEPAL. TSUK DONATED 17 LAKHS RUPESS FOR THIS RECONSTRUCTION PROJECT . ON 21 OCT 2016 - TAMU SAMAJ UK DONATED GBP:1370.00 TO THE DRINKING WATER PROJECT OF CHIPLE VILLAGE, LAMJUNG NEPAL. TSUK ALSO DONATED 10 LHAKHS RUPEES TO MRS PHUL MAYA GURUNG (KUSUM'S MOTHER) ON JAN 2017.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- Nepal
Governance
- 10 December 2012: Standard registration
- TAMU DHEE LONDON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bindu Kumari Gurung | Chair | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suba Ghale | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chandra Kand Gurung | Trustee | 15 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Subasing Gurung | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shiva Chandra Gurung | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shiva Kumar Gurung | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ARJUN KUMAR GURUNG | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
BABU RAM GURUNG | Trustee | 07 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
UDAYA GURUNG | Trustee | 03 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEDAR BAHADUR GURUNG | Trustee | 12 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHITRA BAHADUR GURUNG | Trustee | 12 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.05k | £65.98k | £74.80k | £97.93k | £97.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.49k | £41.59k | £38.74k | £57.40k | £76.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.39k | £12.76k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 June 2021 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 June 2021 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 OCT 2012
Charitable objects
1)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.2)TO RELIEVE THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF THE ELDERLY,SICK AND DISABLED THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FOOD CLOTHING AND HOUSING.3)TO PROVIDE RELIEF AND HELP TO THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND MANMADE DISASTERS.4)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING WHICH IS WORK RELATED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Card Room
Barham Park
660 Harrow Road
WEMBLEY
Middlesex
HA0 2HB
- Phone:
- 07920042697
- Email:
- info@tamusamajuk.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window