Financial history INTERNATIONAL NIEMANN-PICK DISEASE ALLIANCE

Charity Number: 1150256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.43k £41.59k £20.11k £72.32k £214.85k
Total expenditure £33.81k £8.05k £10.39k £57.62k £89.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A