NIGHT CHURCH HASTINGS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To operate Hastings Night Church regularly, in Hastings Town Centre, East Sussex opening from 10pm at night on regular Saturday nights offering Christian love and support to visitors in a non judgemental way.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 04 December 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVE WALLER | Chair | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN JAMES COOPER | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £460 | £310 | £300 | £125 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £356 | £0 | £50 | £60 | £25 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 January 2025 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 SEP 2012
Charitable objects
2.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE STEERING GROUP MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE IN HASTINGS & ROTHER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE STEERING GROUP MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFILL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY. 2.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN HASTINGS & ROTHER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE STEERING GROUP MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 2.3 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CORE VALUES AND MISSION STATEMENT APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN HASTINGS & ROTHER AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE STEERING GROUP MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MEANS OF CARING, LISTENING AND HELPING PEOPLE ON THE STREETS AND AT NIGHT CHURCH VENUES DAY AND NIGHT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Salisbury Road
St. Leonards-on-Sea
TN37 6RX
- Phone:
- 07479957051
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window