Financial history IMPRESSIONS GALLERY OF PHOTOGRAPHY LIMITED

Charity Number: 503238
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £462.16k £393.69k £344.20k £305.02k £348.46k
Total expenditure £429.74k £279.32k £323.10k £297.98k £377.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £260.80k £47.57k £29.57k £246.00k £221.18k