THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST COOKHAM DEAN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All the activities relate to the operation of St John the Baptist Church and include voluntary income, Fundraising income and statutary fees retained for weddings and funerals. Expenditure ralates to upkeep of the Church and Mission giving and Charitable donations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 20 November 2012: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST COOKHAM DEAN (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Stephen Mills | Chair | 11 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Marion Elly | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stella Lesley Fairlie | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Mary Billinghurst | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Anne Satterley | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Webb | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Annette Hazeldine | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Greta Dixon | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Simmonds | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
David Hazeldine | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|||||
John Neil Sykes | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|||||
JOHN PETER FAIRLIE | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
RAY REED | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
LORNA JANE SYKES | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MATHEW JAMES BILLINGHURST | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.39k | £90.92k | £104.28k | £104.60k | £119.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.64k | £93.13k | £96.53k | £102.98k | £99.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Edelwyn
Dean Lane
Cookham
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 9AG
- Phone:
- 01628476963
- Email:
- rahazeldine@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window