WEALD OF KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carrying out supervisory function in respect of Methodist Churches within the Weald of Kent Methodist Circuit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 21 January 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jane Elizabeth Braund | Chair | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Carol Ann Oakley | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Alison Jane Farr | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
SUE WILKINS | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|||||
JOHN ARCHER | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
HUGH EDWARD TAYLOR | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL SMITH | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ELIZABETH ANNE DAGNALL | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIA IRENE BEVIS | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|||||
PETER ALLAN CROUCH FCCA | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Rev BRYAN THOMAS KNAPP BA | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
CHRIS TOWERS | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
CARL ANDREW WARREN BA HONS | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
REG RUMMERY | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE GWENDOLINE MANSER | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY SHEPPARD | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH JOHN BARNES | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev GERALD CHARLES GARDINER BA | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROI JAMES ARDEN | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN MARK BUTT | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN SUAZNABAR | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
REV JOHN STUART CURNOW MA, BA | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN RICHARDSON | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR HENRY GEORGE EDWARDS | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287.22k | £297.90k | £606.23k | £877.30k | £350.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £379.12k | £592.79k | £1.18m | £380.00k | £852.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £872.69k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £2.95k | £4.62k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £603.29k | £312.49k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £1.18m | £61.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £900 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £61.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £318.78k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 July 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20/09/1932
Charitable objects
(A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION BEING A SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Otford Methodist Church
High Street
Otford
SEVENOAKS
TN14 5PH
- Phone:
- 07812077845
- Email:
- admin@wokmc.org.uk
- Website:
-
wokmc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window