Financial history RACEHORSE RESCUE CENTRE

Charity number: 1150864
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £39.87k £137.30k £21.55k £23.26k £12.16k
Total expenditure £10.88k £71.37k £97.46k £44.49k £12.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A