WMUK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and protect the physical and mental health of sufferers of Waldenstrom's Macroglobulinemia (WM) through the provision of financial assistance, support, education and practical advice. To advance the education of the public in the subject of WM. To promote the research into the treatment of WM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 November 2012: Standard registration
- 27 April 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 27 April 2020: Funds transferred to 1187121 WMUK
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.85k | £48.18k | £47.36k | £69.70k | £69.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.04k | £48.02k | £34.79k | £42.59k | £61.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 28 September 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 21 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 21 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04 SEP 2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF WALDENSTROM'S MACROGLOBULINEMIA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF WALDENSTROM'S MACROGLOBULINEMIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window