The Field House Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Presentation of public performances and concerts aimed at advancing the education of the public in the art and appreciation of music and other performing arts. Promoting education in music, in particular but not limited to young people, including awarding bursaries or other funding to enable them to develop their education and skills in music. Making appropriate charitable donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 08 April 2013: Standard registration
- THE COOPER HALL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugh Michael Riddell | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Torun Stavseng | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Morag McLaren BEd MA | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224.14k | £229.89k | £273.03k | £185.23k | £269.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.89k | £230.29k | £267.72k | £193.98k | £269.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/03/2013 as amended on 05 Aug 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC AND OTHER PERFORMING ARTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES AND CONCERTS. 2. TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO YOUNG PEOPLE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS BURSARIES OR OTHER FUNDING TO ENABLE THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR EDUCATION AND SKILLS IN MUSIC. 3. TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Selwood Manor
Jacks Lane
Spring Gardens
Frome
BA11 3NL
- Phone:
- 07711005480
- Email:
- info@cooperhall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window