GREATER MANCHESTER CHURCHES TOGETHER

Charity number: 503258
Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Greater Manchester Churches Together sustains and supports ecumenical developments at, local, parish, Borough and Regional level. The work involves Local Ecumenical Partnerships ,with over 100 Churches Together Groups and meetings of Church Leaders.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £21,248
Total expenditure: £20,257

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bolton
  • Bury
  • Manchester City
  • Oldham
  • Rochdale
  • Salford City
  • Stockport
  • Tameside
  • Trafford
  • Wigan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 May 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GREATER MANCHESTER COUNTY ECUMENICAL COUNCIL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Osiebhulimen Osoba Otaigbe Trustee 01 March 2021
None on record
Rev Glayne Worgan Trustee 30 September 2019
THE AVENUE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: 64 days late
SALE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rev Joanna Helen Farnworth Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record
Rt Rev JOHN STANLEY KENNETH ARNOLD Trustee 30 September 2014
CHURCHES TOGETHER IN LANCASHIRE
Received: On time
THE ATLANTIC TRADING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE SALFORD DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
CATHOLIC TRUTH SOCIETY (DIOCESE OF SALFORD)
Received: On time
CARITAS DIOCESE OF SALFORD
Received: On time
ST CUTHBERT'S COLLEGE USHAW
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
The Right Reverend Mark Davies Trustee 30 October 2012
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE HULME HALL TRUST FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SPRINGHILL HOSPICE (ROCHDALE)
Received: On time
MANCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
GREATER TOGETHER MANCHESTER
Received: On time
MONSIGNOR PAUL SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £236 £32.16k £24.96k £26.01k £21.25k
Total expenditure £13.61k £14.11k £25.65k £24.53k £20.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 550 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 November 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 FAIRFIELD SQUARE
DROYLSDEN
MANCHESTER
M43 6AD
Phone:
01613700132