DIGITAL OPPORTUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DOT UK is an affiliate of Digital Opportunity Trust (DOT), an international social enterprise headquartered in Ottawa, Canada with local operations around the Globe. DOT UK works to fund and implement DOT's cost-effective, youth-led economic and education development programmes for underserved and disadvantaged young people in UK and transitional economies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ethiopia
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Rwanda
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 11 March 2013: Standard registration
- DOT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Kelly | Chair | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daleel Hagy | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Senam Payandeh | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Chandler | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Charles | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Boyle | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Clive Godfrey | Trustee | 13 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.58k | £199.45k | £206.07k | £14.68k | £184.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.28k | £197.91k | £183.92k | £47.56k | £152.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY OR SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Contact information
- Address:
-
WITHERS LLP
20 OLD BAILEY
LONDON
EC4M 7AN
- Phone:
- 07824467813
- Email:
- contact@dotrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window