THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' HARBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, open to all. Provision of sacred space for personal prayer & contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups.Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £58,077 from 2 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 27 February 2013: Previously excepted registration
- HARBURY PCC (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew Batchelor | Chair | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Oliva Stringer | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Marie Browne | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Margaret Barnden | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dean | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Ruth Pedvin-Lewis | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mayer | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jean Hayes | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ALAN JONES | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN JOSEPH ELD | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEOFFREY VINCENT | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|||||
REV ANN MULLEY | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LIZ MCBRIDE | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|||||
WILL JONES | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.44k | £164.58k | £107.44k | £148.56k | £201.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.18k | £77.82k | £77.07k | £160.43k | £285.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | £35.83k | £58.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DENNYS CLOSE
TEMPLE END
HARBURY
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV33 9NE
- Phone:
- 01926614901
- Email:
- vikkihall@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window