GRACE TO YOU EUROPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian teaching via multi-media throughout Europe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Albania
- Belgium
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Faroe Islands
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hungary
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Latvia
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Malta
- Moldova
- Montenegro
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- Vatican City
Governance
- 21 December 2012: Standard registration
- 30 August 2013: Funds received from 286003 THE D M LLOYD-JONES RECORDINGS TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAY ELLIOT FLOWERS | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW THOMAS CURRY | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christian Walter Andresen | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL JOHNSON | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £397.17k | £471.63k | £541.66k | £482.91k | £449.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £371.04k | £392.45k | £399.71k | £555.23k | £586.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £338.68k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £202.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £38 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £399.71k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £59.70k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/12/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 CAXTON HOUSE
WELLESLEY ROAD
ASHFORD
KENT
TN24 8ET
- Phone:
- 01233662262
- Email:
- info@gty.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window