MACE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Mace Foundation drives forward Mace's ambition to make a real and sustainable difference to the lives of people where Mace operates. The Mace Foundation gives back to communities through its charity partnerships and match funding programme for Mace employees. The Foundation focuses its giving on education and employment, economic inequality and health, well-being and environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£681,784
Donations and legacies | £681.78k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£709,194
Raising funds | £75.13k | |
Charitable activities | £634.06k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £75.13k | |
Charitable expenditure | £634.06k |
People

4 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Denmark
- Netherlands
- South Africa
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
Governance
- 12 December 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK PETER REYNOLDS | Chair | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Chamberlain | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brian Eshmade | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Guild | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Martin CROYSDALE | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Priya Jain | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Blackledge | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Wilson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kinsey | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Regan | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Lynn Madams Anstey | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA LOUISE WELCH | Trustee | 03 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE REYNOLDS | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £586.27k | £381.25k | £442.73k | £711.39k | £681.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £620.39k | £356.55k | £424.57k | £660.86k | £709.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £586.27k | N/A | N/A | £711.39k | £681.78k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £599.67k | N/A | N/A | £624.89k | £634.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £20.71k | N/A | N/A | £35.97k | £75.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.65k | N/A | N/A | £3.40k | £5.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £130.00k | N/A | N/A | £520.84k | £522.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £130.88k | N/A | N/A | £205.82k | £177.96k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £82.55k | N/A | N/A | £64.10k | £63.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/11/2012 as amended on 09 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
155 MOORGATE
LONDON
EC2M 6XB
- Phone:
- 02035223000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window