Trustees MACE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1150134

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK PETER REYNOLDS | Chair | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Chamberlain | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brian Eshmade | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Guild | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Martin CROYSDALE | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Priya Jain | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Blackledge | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Wilson | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kinsey | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Regan | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Lynn Madams Anstey | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA LOUISE WELCH | Trustee | 03 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE REYNOLDS | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.