THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, EDGBASTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the Christian religion and service to the Community as part of the Church of England, including weddings, funerals, baptisms, seasonal services and responding to need eg food bank, homeless, Christian Aid. Maintenance of the Church (open each day) and Church Yard. Ministry at the hospice, university, residential homes, schools and community space in our buildings
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 21 November 2012: Previously excepted registration
- EDGBASTON OLD CHURCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Charles Butler | Chair | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Desmond Hatch | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan David Jeffrey Browning | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jem Huggins | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Marie Shelley | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Caswell | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Stuart Gregory | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Catherine Mackenzie Horder | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Frances Angela Clarke | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Michael Phillip Huggins | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Mary Julia Martin | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Cuffin-Munday | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Mayland | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Harris | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS Judy Metcalfe | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOSEPH ALLAN JORDAN | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM GUY SHUBRA HORDERN | Trustee | 20 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.20k | £205.00k | £169.00k | £161.90k | £182.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.00k | £199.10k | £211.00k | £185.90k | £177.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Edgbaston Vicarage
1B Arthur Road
Edgbaston
BIRMINGHAM
B15 2UW
- Phone:
- 0121 454 6436
- Email:
- office@edgbaston.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window