THE ORPHAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports three grass roots orphanages and childcare projects in Bangladesh, by providing grants for books, teachers, medical supplies, uniforms. We are also working with Roehampton University to train front line workers with children in play therapy and get free play therapy to the children on the streets of Dhaka.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 08 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL MORRIS | Chair | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Sofena Choudhury | Trustee | 26 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Gow | Trustee | 26 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Michael Bloc | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
RUKMINAJ MORRIS | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | 01/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.05k | £17.59k | £15.78k | £25.35k | £12.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.38k | £25.90k | £26.30k | £27.59k | £23.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 26 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 FEB 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR POOR AND SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED ORPHANS AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18, LIVING IN LESSOR DEVELOPED COMMUNITIES THROUGHOUT THE WORLD THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: A) CLEAN WATER AND SANITATION FACILITIES B) FOOD AND NUTRITION C) SCHOOL ESTABLISHMENTS INCLUDING THE MAINTENANCE AND PROVISION OF TEACHING FACILITIES D) EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS E) HEALTHCARE MATERIALS F) RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
95 BARTON ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 9LL
- Phone:
- 07974312229
- Email:
- mina@orphantrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window