THE SWALLOWS HEAD & NECK CANCER SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We reach out and offer fantastic support 24/7 and will refer you to other 3rd party services if that's what you need. Our Charity is run by patients, carers, family and friends so everyone understands the problems when you are diagnosed with head and neck cancer. The Swallows was formed by cancer patients to help and support fellow sufferers and their carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Romania
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- THE SWALLOWS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammad Amirkhani | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ali Khurram Professor | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lyanne Wright | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Bannister | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Grice | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Norman Joseph Hill | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.65k | £240.00k | £152.67k | £193.69k | £112.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.40k | £140.00k | £180.78k | £206.44k | £150.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 March 2022
(These accounts |
09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 March 2021
(These accounts |
28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 NOV 2012 ADOPTED 02/11/2012 as amended on 15 May 2024
Charitable objects
I. TO PROVIDE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY HEAD AND NECK CAN-CER THROUGHOUT THE UK AND OTHER COUNTRIES AND IN PARTICULAR TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE EAR, NOSE AND THROAT DEPARTMENT (ENT) OF THE BLACKPOOL VICTORIA HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK CONVALESCENT OR IN ANY WAY DISABLED AND TO GENERALLY SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL. II. TO PROVIDE AWARE-NESS, SUPPORT AND EDUCATION TO HEALTH PROFESSIONALS, PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS, CAREGIVERS AND THE PUBLIC ABOUT HEAD AND NECK CANCER WITHIN THE UK AND OTHER COUNTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Business First Lancaster House
Amy Johnson Way
Blackpool
Blackpool
Lancashire
FY4 2RP
- Phone:
- 01253428940
- Email:
- info@theswallows.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window