NIWE EATING DISTRESS SERVICE TRADING AS EATING DISTRESS NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDNE provides support to people in the North East of England affected by eating disorders/eating distress, who use food in ways which are problematic to them. We provide a safe, non-judgemental environment in which people can begin to move beyond a concentration on their symptoms to address the underlying issues which cause them to use food/food-related behaviours to manage their situation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £118,483 from 3 government contract(s) and £85,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 09 January 2013: Standard registration
- 30 July 2014: Funds received from 1041902 NORTHERN INITIATIVE ON WOMEN AND EATING
- NIWE EATING DISTRESS SERVICE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay Jones | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bentley | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caron Deans | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Callum Robson-Port | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Wheatley | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Radha Sharma | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Patterson | Trustee | 13 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.80k | £218.53k | £255.53k | £390.60k | £353.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.66k | £149.54k | £242.77k | £282.91k | £366.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.91k | N/A | N/A | £62.95k | £118.48k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £62.95k | £85.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 OCT 2012 as amended on 01 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
(A)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES INCLUDING A CONFIDENTIAL HELPLINE/LISTENING SERVICE, GROUPS AND SUPPORT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF WOMEN WITH EATING DISTRESS AND EATING DISORDERS AND TO OFFER CHARITABLE SUPPORT TO THE FAMILIES,FRIENDS AND CARERS OF SUCH PEOPLE;(B)TO PROVIDE A COMPLEMENTARY SERVICE TO EXISTING PROVISIONS; AND (C)TO PROMOTE GREATER KNOWLEDGE AND HEIGHTEN AWARENESS OF EATING DISTRESS AND EATING DISORDERS AND THEIR EFFECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
58
Leazes Park Road
Newcastle-upon-Tyne
Tyne and Wear
NE1 4PG
- Phone:
- 0191 2210233
- Email:
- enquiries@edne.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window