Financial history LEICESTERSHIRE SEARCH AND RESCUE

Charity number: 1150100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £46.88k £37.22k £38.43k £28.65k £70.86k
Total expenditure £59.52k £43.74k £38.14k £29.12k £67.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £16.20k £3.18k N/A £3.00k