Accounts and annual returns AL-MUMINEEN ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF UK AND IRELAND
Charity Number: 1150771

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 February 2024 | 15 February 2025 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 February 2023 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 February 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 February 2021 | 02 April 2022 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 February 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 February 2020 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window