CAMBRIAN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To benefit inhabitants of the Richmond area, especially the Queens Road Estate, with facilities for education, health & recreation whether by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, financial hardship or social & economic circumstances or for the public at large in the interests of social welfare & with the object of improving the condition of life of the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £54,148 from 4 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 28 February 2013: Standard registration
- 03 June 2014: Funds received from 1077016 THE CAMBRIAN COMMUNITY CENTRE
- N/A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Mary Pendle | Chair | 25 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Nigel Leslie Lanch | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Steven Weidman | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Pamela Ann Fleming | Trustee | 19 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Elizabeth Jennifer Nash | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Brian Douglas Shea | Trustee | 14 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Maria Alice Kell | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Kathleen Ann McCormack | Trustee | 08 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||
NICK AKED | Trustee | 17 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
THOMAS O'MALLEY | Trustee | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.13k | £116.15k | £113.94k | £161.16k | £187.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.63k | £122.51k | £95.33k | £137.18k | £126.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.50k | £30.65k | £16.19k | £16.17k | £54.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Grove Road
Richmond
TW10 6SN
- Phone:
- 02089483351
- Email:
- manager@cambriancentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window