Financial history LIFE AID INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity number: 1153440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.69k £6.09k £1.36k £291 £14.47k
Total expenditure £71 £7.00k £1.15k £135 £11.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A