DROITWICH SPA CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 503272
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Stimulates public interest; Promotes high environmental standards; and Secures the preservation, protection, development and improvement of features of historic and public interest in the town of Droitwich Spa and its surrounding area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,701
Total expenditure: £3,023

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 June 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DROITWICH CIVIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lyn Blewitt Trustee 22 November 2022
DROITWICH PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Michael John Meredith Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
STUART COLLINGWOOD HAYWOOD Trustee 20 February 2015
None on record
CHRISTINE MAY BOWERS Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL HAYZELDEN Trustee
DROITWICH PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.24k £1.12k £1.49k £1.09k £3.70k
Total expenditure £3.27k £1.14k £1.12k £904 £3.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Aquarius
Hanbury Road
DROITWICH
Worcestershire
WR9 7DX
Phone:
01905 774906