MAPLE LODGE CONSERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maple Lodge Conservation Society was founded in 1983 with the objective of ensuring that Maple Lodge Nature Reserve continues to provide a safe habitat for wildlife and a pleasant and interesting place for people to visit. The Society has continued to develop and improve the Reserve with a careful management plan and in partnership with the owners, Thames Water.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 31 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Anakin George Hocking | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Anthony Richard Hulls | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Harris | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Catherine Mulligan | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Mary Bessant | Trustee | 16 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Martin David Parr | Trustee | 09 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Smith | Trustee | 09 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.27k | £8.50k | £3.55k | £8.60k | £8.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.18k | £2.79k | £6.55k | £8.28k | £4.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 APR 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE: 2.1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO MANAGE MAPLE LODGE NATURE RESERVE ("THE RESERVE")IN A MANNER THAT CONSERVES ITS FLORA, FAUNA AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND PRESERVES ITS CONSERVATION VALUE. 2.2. FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE PUBLIC AND OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES, TO UNDERTAKE A PROGRAMME OF FIELDWORK, SURVEYING AND RECORDING ON THE RESERVE. 2.3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FLORA, FAUNA AND THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT OF THE RESERVE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
MAPLE LODGE NATURE RESERVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 Felbridge Avenue
STANMORE
Middlesex
HA7 2BJ
- Phone:
- 07580535986
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window